|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 3094.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2367.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1811.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|