California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill July 13, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011