|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1860.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1233.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 1166.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|