LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB130
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB130
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB130
Compare Versions
AB130 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB130 Enrolled July 18, 2011
AB130 Amended May 2, 2011
AB130 Amended April 6, 2011
AB130 Amended March 17, 2011
AB130 Amended March 8, 2011
AB130 Introduced January 11, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB130 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB130 Enrolled July 18, 2011
AB130 Amended May 2, 2011
AB130 Amended April 6, 2011
AB130 Amended March 17, 2011
AB130 Amended March 8, 2011
AB130 Introduced January 11, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare