California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011