LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1314
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1314
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1314
Compare Versions
AB1314 Chaptered October 6, 2011
AB1314 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1314 Amended August 29, 2011
AB1314 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1314 Amended March 31, 2011
AB1314 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1314 Chaptered October 6, 2011
AB1314 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1314 Amended August 29, 2011
AB1314 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1314 Amended March 31, 2011
AB1314 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare