|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2889.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 2133.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 1510.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 7.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|