LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1319
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1319
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1319
Compare Versions
AB1319 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB1319 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1319 Amended August 22, 2011
AB1319 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1319 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1319 Amended May 10, 2011
AB1319 Amended April 28, 2011
AB1319 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1319 Chaptered October 4, 2011
AB1319 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1319 Amended August 22, 2011
AB1319 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1319 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1319 Amended May 10, 2011
AB1319 Amended April 28, 2011
AB1319 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare