|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6616.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6404.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4642.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to the unfinished business file.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2359.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1814.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|