California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill June 11, 2012
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill June 23, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011