|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3096.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2355.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|