LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1329
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1329
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1329
Compare Versions
AB1329 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB1329 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1329 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1329 Amended July 11, 2011
AB1329 Amended May 5, 2011
AB1329 Amended May 3, 2011
AB1329 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1329 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB1329 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1329 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1329 Amended July 11, 2011
AB1329 Amended May 5, 2011
AB1329 Amended May 3, 2011
AB1329 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare