California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill July 14, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011