LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1352
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1352
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1352
Compare Versions
AB1352 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB1352 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB1352 Amended August 30, 2011
AB1352 Amended July 14, 2011
AB1352 Amended March 22, 2011
AB1352 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1352 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB1352 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB1352 Amended August 30, 2011
AB1352 Amended July 14, 2011
AB1352 Amended March 22, 2011
AB1352 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare