|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 232, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5883.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4444.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 3501.)
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|