California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill April 12, 2011