California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012