LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB137
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB137
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB137
Compare Versions
AB137 Chaptered September 22, 2012
AB137 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB137 Amended August 22, 2012
AB137 Amended August 6, 2012
AB137 Amended January 23, 2012
AB137 Introduced January 12, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB137 Chaptered September 22, 2012
AB137 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB137 Amended August 22, 2012
AB137 Amended August 6, 2012
AB137 Amended January 23, 2012
AB137 Introduced January 12, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare