California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 29, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011