|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 3139.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 19. Page 2396.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1585.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|