California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Amended

Bill September 2, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill May 19, 2011
Bill May 4, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011