LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1402
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1402
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1402
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 2, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 24, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 7, 2011
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 1, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 30, 2011
Compare