LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1402
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1402
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1402
Compare Versions
AB1402 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB1402 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB1402 Amended June 1, 2011
AB1402 Amended March 30, 2011
AB1402 Introduced March 2, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1402 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB1402 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB1402 Amended June 1, 2011
AB1402 Amended March 30, 2011
AB1402 Introduced March 2, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare