|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 775, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6500.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6404.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 4779.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1394.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|