California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012