|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 107, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5554.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4181.).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1178.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|