California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill June 6, 2012
Bill April 25, 2011