|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1347.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|