LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1409
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1409
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1409
Compare Versions
AB1409 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1409 Amended March 22, 2012
AB1409 Amended March 21, 2012
AB1409 Amended April 25, 2011
AB1409 Introduced March 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1409 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1409 Amended March 22, 2012
AB1409 Amended March 21, 2012
AB1409 Amended April 25, 2011
AB1409 Introduced March 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare