|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 9). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3226.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3059.)
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2352.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1566.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|