California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1417 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 31, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011