|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 490, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 8). Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 3142.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2940.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2192.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1393.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|