California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 16, 2011