|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3102.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2350.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1569.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|