California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill August 31, 2011
Bill August 24, 2011
Bill May 19, 2011