|
10/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2543.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1915.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1047.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|