California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2011

Amended

Bill June 27, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011