|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4280.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4219.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4099.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|