California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1498 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 28, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012