|
09/01/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 5122.) Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 5122.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5910.).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|