California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1500 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill February 9, 2012