07/03/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
06/28/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
06/27/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
03/22/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
03/22/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4101.) | |||
03/19/2012 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
01/11/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |||
01/10/2012 | Read first time. To print. |