California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1503 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 07/03/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1503AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Perea  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Conway   )  (  Coauthors:   Senators   Fuller     and Rubio   Coauthor:   Senator   Rubio  ) JANUARY 10, 2012 An  actto   act to  amend Sections 2 and 3 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, to amend Section 9 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 226 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to elections, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1503, as amended, Perea. Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012: submission to voters. Existing law creates the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, which, if approved by the voters, would authorize the issuance of bonds in the amount of $11,140,000,000 pursuant to the State General Obligation Bond Law to finance a safe drinking water and water supply reliability program. Existing law provides for the submission of the bond act to the voters at the November 6, 2012, statewide general election. This bill would instead provide for the submission of the bond act to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. The bill would appropriate $1,000 to the Secretary of State to implement the requirements of the bill. This bill would declare that it is to take immediate effect as an urgency statute and a bill providing for appropriations related to the Budget Bill. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, as amended by Section 7 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, is amended to read: Sec. 2. Section 1 of this act shall be submitted to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election, instead of the November 6, 2012, statewide general election, in accordance with provisions of the Government Code and the Elections Code governing the submission of a statewide measure to the voters. SEC. 2. Section 3 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, as amended by Section 8 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, is amended to read: Sec. 3. Section 1 of this act shall take effect only upon the approval by the voters of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, as set forth in that section at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. SEC. 3. Section 9 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010 is amended to read: Sec. 9. The Secretary of State shall submit the heading of Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) of, and Sections 79700, 79702, 79716, 79749, and 79749.5 of, the Water Code, as amended by Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, of this act, in place of the heading of Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) of, and Sections 79700, 79702, 79716, 79749, and 79749.5 of, the Water Code, as added by Section 1 of Chapter 3 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, in order that they are voted upon as part of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. SEC. 4. Section 2 of Chapter 226 of the Statutes of 2010 is amended to read: Sec. 2. The Secretary of State shall submit Section 79770 of the Water Code, as amended by Section 1 of this act, in place of Section 79770 of the Water Code, as added by Section 1 of Chapter 3 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, in order that it is voted upon as part of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012 at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. SEC. 5. The sum of one thousand dollars ($1,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Secretary of State to implement the requirements of this act. SEC. 6. This act is a bill providing for appropriations related to the Budget Bill within the meaning of subdivision (e) of Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution, has been identified as related to the budget in the Budget Bill, and shall take effect immediately. SEC. 7. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012 is submitted to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.