05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/18/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
03/08/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
01/13/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | |||
01/12/2012 | Read first time. To print. |