California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1506 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 03/08/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1506AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 8, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Jeffries and Cook (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Nielsen and Olsen) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Conway, Donnelly, Beth Gaines, Grove,  Hagman,  Harkey, Jones, Knight, Logue, Morrell, Nestande,  Silva,  and Valadao) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Berryhill, Cannella, Dutton,  Fuller,  Gaines,  Huff,  La Malfa,  Runner,  Strickland, and Wyland) JANUARY 12, 2012 An act to repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1506, as amended, Jeffries. State responsibility areas: fire prevention fees. Existing law requires the State Board of Forestry and Fire Protection, on or before September 1, 2011, to adopt emergency regulations to establish a fire prevention fee in an amount not to exceed $150 to be charged on each structure on a parcel that is within a state responsibility area, as defined, and requires that the fire prevention fee be adjusted annually using prescribed methods. Existing law requires the State Board of Equalization to collect the fire prevention fees, as prescribed, commencing with the 2011-12 fiscal year. Existing law establishes the State Responsibility Area Fire Prevention Fund and prohibits the collection of fire prevention fees if, commencing with the 2012-13 fiscal year, there are sufficient amounts of moneys in the fund to finance specified fire prevention activities for a fiscal year. Existing law requires that the fire prevention fees collected, except as provided, be deposited into the fund and be made available, to the board and the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection for certain specified fire protection activities that benefit the owners of structures in state responsibility areas who are required to pay the fee. Existing law further requires the board, on and after January 1, 2013, to submit an annual written report to the Legislature on specified topics. This bill would repeal the above provisions relating to the fire prevention fees. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to repeal the fire prevention fee imposed pursuant to Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code is repealed.