|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6099.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4587.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4813.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4767.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 5). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|