LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1508
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1508
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1508
Compare Versions
AB1508 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1508 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB1508 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1508 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1508 Amended May 10, 2012
AB1508 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1508 Amended February 28, 2012
AB1508 Introduced January 12, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1508 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1508 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB1508 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1508 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1508 Amended May 10, 2012
AB1508 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1508 Amended February 28, 2012
AB1508 Introduced January 12, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare