|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 270, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2487.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1961.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1551.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|