LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB151
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB151
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB151
Compare Versions
AB151 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB151 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB151 Amended June 29, 2011
AB151 Introduced February 1, 2011
AB151 Introduced January 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB151 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB151 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB151 Amended June 29, 2011
AB151 Introduced February 1, 2011
AB151 Introduced January 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare