|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 855, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 6690.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 5024.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 29). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5101.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|